Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2222 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20025 Week
» 73041 Month
» 192568 Year
» 3219421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1788 |
m/e |
09/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9143 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
49143 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4948 |
To Service |
During 09/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/10/1959 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1788 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4948 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9143 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49143 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49143 |
|
|