Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32068 Week
» 130713 Month
» 333377 Year
» 3360230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2030 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9118 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49118 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4928 |
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1947 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/12/1947 |
Crewe Works Scrapyard |
The Scrap line consisted of Nos. 9118, 9215, 9380, 27663, 6725, 7944, 25845, 28288, an 28315. |
SLS/194801 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2030 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4928 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9118 |
|
|
12/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9118 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49118 but not taken up |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|