Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4273 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34923 Week
» 133568 Month
» 336232 Year
» 3363085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1897 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9370 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
49370 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4191 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/06/1951 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 7 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
5B |
|
Crewe South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10C |
|
Patricroft |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
3D |
|
Aston |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
9A |
Longsight |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1897 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4191 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9370 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49370 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49370 |
|
|