Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3088 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33738 Week
» 132383 Month
» 335047 Year
» 3361900 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1877 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9046 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49046 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4031 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Fri 08/03/1957 (At Crewe Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Crewe Works |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,157,357 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1877 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4031 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9046 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
13/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49046 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
09/10/1955 |
To Store |
To Store (Hereford) |
|
|
28/11/1955 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
08/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49046 |
|
|
22/03/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|