Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4593 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30627 Week
» 129272 Month
» 331936 Year
» 3358789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1873 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9007 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
49007 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4027 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1873 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4027 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9007 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49007 |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49007 |
|
|