Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3250 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29284 Week
» 127929 Month
» 330593 Year
» 3357446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1866 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9002 |
m/e |
10/1923 |
British Railways |
49002 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3903 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1866 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3903 |
|
|
10/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9002 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49002 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49002 |
|
|