Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 43 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30693 Week
» 129338 Month
» 332002 Year
» 3358855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1819 |
m/e |
12/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9058 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
49058 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3824 |
To Service |
During 12/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1950 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1819 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3824 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9058 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Widnes (8D) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49058 but not taken up |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9058 |
|
|