Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3134 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33784 Week
» 132429 Month
» 335093 Year
» 3361946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2540 |
m/e |
08/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9020 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
49020 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3665 |
To Service |
During 08/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1896 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2540 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3665 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9020 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Widnes (8D) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49020 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49020 |
|
|