Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2450 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33100 Week
» 131745 Month
» 334409 Year
» 3361262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2536 |
m/e |
08/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9033 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
49033 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3661 |
To Service |
During 08/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Tue 10/12/1957 (At Crewe Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Crewe Works |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,258,134 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1896 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2536 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3661 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9033 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49033 |
|
|
10/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49033 |
|
|
03/01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|