Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3492 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16898 Week
» 69914 Month
» 189441 Year
» 3216294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2528 |
m/e |
11/1894 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9027 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
British Railways |
49027 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3548 |
To Service |
During 11/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/11/1959 |
Service Life |
65 yrs , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1894 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10C |
|
Patricroft |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1894 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2528 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3548 |
|
|
12/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9027 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49027 |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49027 |
|
|