Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1687 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7471 Week
» 28860 Month
» 148387 Year
» 3175240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4067 |
02/05/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/05/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/05/1961 |
Power Unit 61A255 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4067 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
31/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
13/12/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4067 |
|
|