Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31694 Week
» 130339 Month
» 333003 Year
» 3359856 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2193 |
m/e |
1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
2233 |
y/e |
1924 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1939) |
2193 |
y/e |
1939 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1947) |
1993 |
w/e |
24/06/1947 |
British Railways |
41993 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
1912 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
33B |
|
Tilbury |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
33A |
|
Plaistow |
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
33B |
Tilbury |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
33A |
Plaistow |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1912 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2193 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5607 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2233 |
|
|
1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2193 |
|
|
24/06/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1993 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41993 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
19/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41993 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|