Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3228 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30407 Week
» 21463 Month
» 367887 Year
» 3394740 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2459 |
m/e |
04/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1918 |
y/e |
1907 |
Midland Railway (1934) |
7218 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47218 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2441 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1656 |
To Service |
During 04/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1900 |
14A |
|
Cricklewood East |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18C |
|
Hasland |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2459 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1656 |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1918 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7218 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47218 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47218 |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|