Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3144 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33794 Week
» 132439 Month
» 335103 Year
» 3361956 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2454 |
m/e |
03/1900 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1913 |
y/e |
1907 |
Midland Railway (1934) |
7213 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47213 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2441 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1651 |
To Service |
During 03/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/03/1962 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2454 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 1651 |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1913 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7213 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47213 |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47213 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|