Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 581 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31231 Week
» 129876 Month
» 332540 Year
» 3359393 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16760 |
m/e |
08/1931 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7677 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47677 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
82 |
To Service |
During 08/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/11/1965 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16760 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7677 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47677 |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47677 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|