Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2514 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29693 Week
» 20749 Month
» 367173 Year
» 3394026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16732 |
m/e |
02/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7649 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47649 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
397 |
To Service |
During 02/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
4w/e |
08/08/1964 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
05/12/1964 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
04/12/1965 |
ALLOC |
CreweWorks |
|
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16732 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 397 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7649 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47649 |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47649 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|