Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3574 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34224 Week
» 132869 Month
» 335533 Year
» 3362386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16677 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7594 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47594 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
59 |
Works Number |
2345 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 11/07/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16677 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2345 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7594 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47594 |
|
|
23/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47594 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|