Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1565 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 28744 Week
» 19800 Month
» 366224 Year
» 3393077 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16482 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7399 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47399 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
3970 |
To Service |
During 11/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/08/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
5w/e |
31/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
5E |
Alsager |
5w/e |
03/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16482 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3970 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7399 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47399 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47399 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|