Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3054 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30233 Week
» 21289 Month
» 367713 Year
» 3394566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16405 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7322 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47322 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16405 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23401 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7322 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47322 |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47322 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|