Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3367 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 30546 Week
» 21602 Month
» 368026 Year
» 3394879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7110 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7270 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47270 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
12 |
Works Number |
3727 |
To Service |
During 08/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/09/1962 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7110 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3727 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7270 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47270 |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47270 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|