Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3096 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33746 Week
» 132391 Month
» 335055 Year
» 3361908 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
538 |
m/e |
10/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16164 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
56164 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
498 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
Order Number |
Y121 |
To Service |
During 10/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/11/1958 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 538 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 16164 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 56164 |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
18/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 56164 |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|