Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4318 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34968 Week
» 133613 Month
» 336277 Year
» 3363130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
435 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12416 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52416 |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
40 |
Works Number |
707 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs , 9 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1916 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 435 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 707 |
|
|
03/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12416 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52416 |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52416 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|