Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3152 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33802 Week
» 132447 Month
» 335111 Year
» 3361964 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
446 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12592 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52592 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
39 |
Works Number |
680 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/08/1954 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25C |
Goole |
4w/e |
27/04/1946 |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
25D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/08/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1915 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
02/1921 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
02/1921 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 446 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 680 |
|
|
06/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
02/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
02/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12592 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52592 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52592 |
|
|