Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1064 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31714 Week
» 130359 Month
» 333023 Year
» 3359876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
465 |
m/e |
06/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12360 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52360 |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
31 |
Works Number |
523 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/11/1958 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1913 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 465 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 523 |
|
|
02/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12360 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52360 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
08/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52360 |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|