Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3190 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33840 Week
» 132485 Month
» 335149 Year
» 3362002 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1307 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12575 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52575 |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
25 |
Works Number |
427 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/12/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1896 |
25E |
|
Sowerby Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26C |
|
Bolton |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/12/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1915 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1915 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1307 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 427 |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12575 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52575 |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52575 |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|