Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3877 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 31056 Week
» 22112 Month
» 368536 Year
» 3395389 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1086 |
m/e |
06/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12126 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52126 |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
6 |
Works Number |
84 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/05/1951 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1905 |
Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1086 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 84 |
|
|
10/1905 |
Modification |
Modification: Boiler with Round Topped Firebox fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12126 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52126 |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52126 |
|
|