Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2246 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32896 Week
» 131541 Month
» 334205 Year
» 3361058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4456 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
44456 |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 02/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/03/1965 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1928 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9G |
|
Northwich |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
9G |
|
Northwich |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10G |
|
Skipton |
w/e |
19/12/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9G |
Northwich |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
10G |
Skipton |
5w/e |
09/01/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4456 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44456 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
19/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (10G) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44456 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|