Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4037 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34687 Week
» 133332 Month
» 335996 Year
» 3362849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4454 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
44454 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 02/1928 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4454 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44454 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12F) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44454 |
|
|
11/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|