|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/07/1952 | Moor Row MPD | The two regular 'standard class 4' 0-6-0's of this depot are both away for heavy repairs and have been replaced by 44346 from Upperby and 44081 from Penrith-both on loan. 52509 is parted from her tender and jacked up in an undignified position, as if kneeling in prayer, during which time Fitter Mitchell is putting new brasses in her axle boxes. 52494 is at work, as are 52201 an 52285. The four 0-6-0 tanks remain as previously. Moor Row now provides motive power for the evening workmen's passenger train from Sellafield to Barrow, the engine returning with the 21.20 passenger train from Barrow to Corkickle. 44346 has the job at present. |
SLS/195208 |
01/02/1958 | LMR regional adjustments | In connection with the Regional adjustments as from 1st February, the Depot Code for Carlisle (Upperby) has been altered from 12A to 12B. The following locomotives are affected: D3170, 12083, 13087/8, 13171, 40628/9/56, 42426/30, 42539/94, 42664, 43896, 44060/81, 44121/6, 44346, 44936/9, 45041/70, 45106/40/84/5/97, 45244/6/8/58/9 86/93/5/6, 45315/6/7/23/9/48/51/68/71/82/94/7, 45402/9/12/4/31/7/8/45/51/94, 45500/2/4/6/8/12/3/24/6/37/41/2/3/9/51/88/93/6/9, 45613/66, 45723,46106/26/36/41/8/65/7, 46226/38/55, 46449, 47292/5, 47326/40/77/91,47408/15, 47602/14/8/64/6. | SLS/195802 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1925 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4081 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
04/02/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44081 | ||
10/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 44081 | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |