Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 685 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18488 Week
» 71504 Month
» 191031 Year
» 3217884 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
977 |
|
12/1887 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
12064 |
|
1924 |
British Railways |
52064 |
|
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Barton Wright / J. Aspinall |
Class |
568 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
2860 |
To Service |
During 12/1887 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 02/12/1950 |
Service Life |
63 yrs , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1897 |
Reboilered |
04/1913 |
Reboilered |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1887 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 977 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 2860 |
|
|
08/1897 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
04/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Reboilered |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12064 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52064 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52064 |
|
|