Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2916 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16322 Week
» 69338 Month
» 188865 Year
» 3215718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2330 |
m/e |
03/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8417 |
m/e |
04/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28417 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
British Railways |
58376 |
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1896 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2330 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3626 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8417 |
|
|
10/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28417 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
18/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58376 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58376 |
|
|