Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2321 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8408 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28408 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
British Railways |
58375 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/08/1952 |
Bangor MPD |
Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. |
SLS/195211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2321 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3617 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8408 |
|
|
09/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28408 |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58375 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
12/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58375 |
|
|