Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15266 Week
» 68282 Month
» 187809 Year
» 3214662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4045 |
15/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08877 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/11/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
fA |
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/12/1960 |
Power Unit IH4509 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4045 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
06/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08877 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|