Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2237 |
m/e |
02/1895 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1390 |
m/e |
09/1907 |
British Railways |
58075 |
|
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3204 |
To Service |
During 02/1895 to Saltley (3) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 03/10/1953 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1906 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
05/10/1940 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2237 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3204 Allocated to Saltley (3) |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
12/1906 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1390 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (8) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (7) |
|
|
05/10/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58075 |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (23A) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58075 |
|
|