Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 897 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14303 Week
» 67319 Month
» 186846 Year
» 3213699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
2229 |
m/e |
04/1895 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1382 |
m/e |
07/1907 |
British Railways |
58073 |
|
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2228 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Works Number |
3216 |
To Service |
During 04/1895 to Kentish Town (16) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 28/01/1956 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1912 |
LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
21/04/1928 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 2229 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3216 Allocated to Kentish Town (16) |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (15S) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (15S) |
|
|
07/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1382 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
01/1912 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'C' boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (16) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (15) |
|
|
21/04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (M15) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (M15) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58073 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Highbridge (71J) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58073 |
|
|