Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 288 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14331 Week
» 79285 Month
» 281949 Year
» 3308802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
1737 |
m/e |
05/1886 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
1330 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
British Railways |
58051 |
|
26/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
1532 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 05/1886 to Bourne (10B) |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 03/11/1956 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1897 |
18" Cylinders fitted |
23/02/1952 |
LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1886 |
To Service |
To service as Midland Railway Number 1737 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Bourne (10B) |
|
|
04/1892 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (6) |
|
|
11/1897 |
Modification |
Modification: 18" Cylinders fitted |
|
|
01/1899 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
12/1902 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (5) |
|
|
03/1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1330 |
|
|
05/1908 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (MR) (4) |
|
|
04/1914 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (MR) (4) |
|
|
12/1921 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (MR) (4) |
|
|
03/1930 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (MR) (4) |
|
|
09/1933 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (7) |
|
|
11/1945 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58051 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: LMS 'G5½' boiler fitted |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Highbridge (71J) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58051 |
|
|