Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 815 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14221 Week
» 67237 Month
» 186764 Year
» 3213617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4042 |
26/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08874 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
26/11/1960 |
Power Unit IH4619 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4042 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08874 |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Buckeye couplings fitted |
|
|
14/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08874 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|