Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2808 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16214 Week
» 69230 Month
» 188757 Year
» 3215610 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
12 |
m/e |
05/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
11241 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
51241 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1153 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
65 |
Works Number |
1095 |
To Service |
During 05/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 18/01/1962 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1910 |
25C |
|
Goole |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26B |
|
Agecroft |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
53E |
|
Goole |
5w/e |
20/07/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/01/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1960 |
Aspinall 0-4-0ST |
With regard to the Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 0F 0-4-0ST locos.; at the time of writing these are still well represented, with a total of fourteen in stock, distributed as follows : Agecroft 51204 an 51207 (26B), Bank Hall 51206, 51227, 51229, 51232, 51237, 51246 an 51253 (27A), Goole 51222, 51241 an 51244 (50D), and Bristol Barrow Road 51217 an 51218 (82E). |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 12 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1095 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11241 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51241 |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
18/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51241 |
|
|