Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 329 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18132 Week
» 71148 Month
» 190675 Year
» 3217528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1156 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
11204 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
51204 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1153 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-0ST |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
10 |
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/09/1962 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1960 |
Aspinall 0-4-0ST |
With regard to the Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 0F 0-4-0ST locos.; at the time of writing these are still well represented, with a total of fourteen in stock, distributed as follows : Agecroft 51204 an 51207 (26B), Bank Hall 51206, 51227, 51229, 51232, 51237, 51246 an 51253 (27A), Goole 51222, 51241 an 51244 (50D), and Bristol Barrow Road 51217 an 51218 (82E). |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1156 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 11204 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 51204 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 51204 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|