Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1755 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7539 Week
» 28928 Month
» 148455 Year
» 3175308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4039 |
17/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08871 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/11/1960 |
Power Unit IH4563 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4039 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
20/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08871 |
|
|
27/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08871 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|