Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4034 |
23/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08866 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
23/09/1960 |
Power Unit IH4588 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4034 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08866 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (WH) |
|
|
10/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|