Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14432 Week
» 67448 Month
» 186975 Year
» 3213828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4030 |
08/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08862 |
24/11/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/07/1960 |
Power Unit IH4501 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4030 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08862 |
|
|
08/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
09/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
28/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08862 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
10/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|