Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1515 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19318 Week
» 72334 Month
» 191861 Year
» 3218714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4027 |
15/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08859 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
25/11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
10/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
25/11/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4027 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
22/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08859 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
01/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
25/11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08859 from March (MR) |
|
|
30/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|