Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4020 |
12/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08852 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
04/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4020 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08852 |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/08/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08852 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
16/11/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|