Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1065 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6849 Week
» 28238 Month
» 147765 Year
» 3174618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4018 |
01/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08850 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
27/01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
27/01/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4018 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
14/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08850 |
|
|
07/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
21/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|
11/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08850 from Reading (W.R.) (RG) |
|
|