Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 512 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19423 Week
» 84377 Month
» 287041 Year
» 3313894 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4012 |
26/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08844 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
04/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4012 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
28/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08844 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|