Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 168 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17971 Week
» 70987 Month
» 190514 Year
» 3217367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4006 |
03/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08838 |
11/10/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
12/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4006 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
29/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
15/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08838 |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/05/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08838 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
02/02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|