Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17992 Week
» 71008 Month
» 190535 Year
» 3217388 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4002 |
12/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08834 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/09/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
13/09/1975 |
xr |
Dual brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4002 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08834 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
13/09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|