Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 375 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6159 Week
» 27548 Month
» 147075 Year
» 3173928 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4 |
26/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
44004 |
08/04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
44 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Route Disc Indicators Nose end Gangway |
|
Cost when Built |
£129,371.00 |
To Service |
26/09/1959 to Camden (1B) |
Withdrawn |
30/11/1980 off Toton (TO) |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
26/09/1959 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/12/1962 |
E.4983 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£345/-/- |
|
£345/-/- |
02/12/1962 |
R.12286 |
SLM Exhausters
|
|
£14/10/- |
£4/-/- |
£18/10/- |
02/12/1962 |
C/RC/19 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
£196/10/- |
|
£196/10/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/12/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Not known |
|
|
26/01/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
11/05/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
19/10/1959 |
n/a |
|
23/11/1959 |
Light Casual |
|
|
30 days |
30 days |
£1,008.00 |
2,211 |
|
Derby Works |
21/06/1960 |
211 days |
|
18/08/1960 |
Heavy Casual |
1 day |
5 days |
44 days |
50 days |
£226.00 |
13,552 |
|
Crewe Works |
01/10/1960 |
44 days |
|
02/11/1960 |
Non Classified |
7 days |
4 days |
16 days |
27 days |
£59.00 |
17,786 |
|
Crewe Works |
13/06/1961 |
223 days |
|
22/06/1961 |
Non Classified |
|
2 days |
6 days |
8 days |
£3,891.00 |
51,830 |
|
Crewe Works |
29/12/1961 |
190 days |
|
12/02/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
3 days |
6 days |
29 days |
38 days |
£847.00 |
85,518 |
|
Derby Works |
22/10/1962 |
252 days |
|
17/11/1962 |
Light Casual |
2 days |
1 day |
20 days |
23 days |
£3,300.00 |
103,988 |
|
Derby Works |
04/04/1963 |
138 days |
|
05/07/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
1 day |
77 days |
78 days |
|
117,897 |
|
Derby Works |
01/01/1964 |
180 days |
|
10/01/1964 |
Non Classified |
4 days |
1 day |
3 days |
8 days |
|
182,536 |
|
Derby Works |
28/01/1964 |
18 days |
|
18/03/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
1 day |
42 days |
43 days |
|
3,172 |
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
3,871 |
3,871 |
4,754g |
0.81 |
|
|
30 |
30 |
40 |
£189 |
1 |
|
|
71 |
1960 |
20,838 |
24,709 |
27,258g |
0.76 |
1 |
9 |
67 |
77 |
127 |
£669 |
14 |
|
|
218 |
1961 |
60,650 |
85,359 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
22,473 |
107,832 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
24,693 |
132,525 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4, name: GREAT GABLE Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
23/11/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 23/11/1959. Stopped on 19/10/1959 |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
18/08/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 18/08/1960. Stopped on 21/06/1960 |
|
|
02/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 02/11/1960. Stopped on 01/10/1960 |
|
|
22/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 22/06/1961. Stopped on 13/06/1961 |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 12/02/1962. Stopped on 29/12/1961 |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 17/11/1962. Stopped on 22/10/1962 |
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: SLM Exhausters
|
|
|
02/12/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
05/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 05/07/1963. Stopped on 04/04/1963 |
|
|
10/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 10/01/1964. Stopped on 01/01/1964 |
|
|
18/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Dep: 18/03/1964. Stopped on 28/01/1964 |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
02/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44004 |
|
|
30/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44004 from Toton (TO) |
|
|