Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1992 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15398 Week
» 68414 Month
» 187941 Year
» 3214794 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3990 |
09/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08822 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1971 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
02/1971 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3990 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08822 |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|